Jang, Hyun-Jung (CPSO#: 79856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 13 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Suite 1 PMB - 272
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3372
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Hyun Jung Jang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jang ( CPSO# 79856 )

Business Address:
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
1 PMB-272
Suite C-546
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
918 - 399 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HYUN-JUNG JANG may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. JANG holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. JANG may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. JANG no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. JANG no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. JANG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015