Jang, Karen Yuen Kiu (CPSO#: 90815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 6225
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9060 Jane St
Concord ON  L4K 0G5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

610 University Avenue, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 416-946-2297
Fax: (416) 946-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

9325 Yonge Street
Suite 18
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 770-3438
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Crossways Clinic
2340 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 392-0999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Jang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jang ( CPSO# 90815 )

Business Address:
Womens College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN YUEN KIU JANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2011 to 28 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011