Jani, Prashant Anantrai (CPSO#: 78594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Pune, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Pathology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6591
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Prashant Jani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jani ( CPSO# 78594 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Center
Department of Pathology
980 Oliver Road
Suite 1726
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6591

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRASHANT ANANTRAI JANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2003 to 30 Apr 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2015