Jankov, Robert Peter (CPSO#: 70378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Apr 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 4029
Fax: (613) 738-4847
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. P. Jankov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jankov ( CPSO# 70378 )

Business Address:
C H E O
Division of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 May 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Robert Peter Jankov may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Pediatrics, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Jankov holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Jankov no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This certificate is issued on May 5, 2017, and expires on April 30, 2020.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Jankov's academic appointment at the University of
                  Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in
                  paragraph 2 above.