Janmohamed, Anisa (CPSO#: 76497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MD-Direct
236 Avenue Road, Suite 200
Toronto ON  M5R 2J4
Phone: 416-922-2000
Fax: 416-922-2005
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anisa Janmohamed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Janmohamed ( CPSO# 76497 )

Business Address:
MD-Direct
236 Aevnue Road
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M5R 2J4
Phone Number: (416) 922-2000

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Business Address:
76 Greenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANISA JANMOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANMOHAMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003