Jansen, Marcus Cole (CPSO#: 95921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Physical Medicine and Rehab
752 King St W, Kingston, ON K7M 9A7
Kingston ON  K7M 9A7
Phone: 613-544-4900 Ext. 53293
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS COLE JANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 May 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013