Jarbo, Ashraf (CPSO#: 98983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashraf Jarbo and Dr. Wijdan Fadholi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Fadholi ( CPSO# 114104)
Dr. A. Jarbo ( CPSO# 98983 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHRAF JARBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARBO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017