Jarecki, Joanna (CPSO#: 94034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main East Medical
685 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K4
Phone: 289-396-2316
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Psychotherapy Centre
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 39881
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jarecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jarecki ( CPSO# 94034 )

Business Address:
460 Main Street East
Suite 404
Hamilton ON  L8N 1K4
Phone Number: (289) 396-2316

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Cleghorn Early Intervention Clinic
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA JARECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARECKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2016