Jarmuske, Mario Byron (CPSO#: 64085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Module S 6
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73047
Fax: (613) 737-8676
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. B. Jarmuske Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 28 2018


Corporation Name: M. B. Jarmuske Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jarmuske ( CPSO# 64085 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Module S Room S6
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIO BYRON JARMUSKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARMUSKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1991

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)