Jarvis, Carl William (CPSO#: 74414)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2004 to 05 Mar 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 2008