Jarvis, Jolene Eliza (CPSO#: 74544)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Mar 2000 to 29 Mar 2000
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003