Jassam, Jabir Mohammed (CPSO#: 84994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Treasure Medical Center
Unit 104
10 Green Street
Ottawa ON  K2J 3Z6
Phone: (613) 825-0544
Fax: (613) 825-0543
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jabir Jassam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jassam ( CPSO# 84994 )

Business Address:
Health Treasure Medical Centre
10 Green Street
Suite 104
Ottawa ON  K2J 3Z6
Phone Number: (613) 825-0544

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JABIR MOHAMMED JASSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASSAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2007 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2009