Jassemi, Sara (CPSO#: 105460)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Adolescent Medicine
Black Wing, Room 7405
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5804
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: The Hospital for Sick Children 555 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 1X8
Date Received: 07 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2015 to 08 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2016 to 10 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018