Jaswal, Gurpreet (CPSO#: 97725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
DOM, 3rd Floor, Rm. 3445
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 4496
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 905 848-7100 Ext. 0
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURPREET JASWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017