Jayaram, Lata (CPSO#: 71343)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Auckland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Jun 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 01 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2000