Jayaraman, Jai (CPSO#: 78814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Nov 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Cornell University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jai Jayaraman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jayaraman ( CPSO# 78814 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  May  1,  2018,  the  following  is  imposed  as a term, condition and
            limitation  on the certificate of registration held by Dr.  Jai  Jayaraman,  in
            accordance with  an  undertaking  and  consent  given  by  Dr. Jayaraman to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Jai Jayaraman shall limit his practice in Ontario  to  Humber  River
                  Hospital  unless  such  other  practice  location  is pre-approved by the
                  College in its sole discretion.  For further clarity, Dr. Jayaraman shall
                  not engage in any office practice whatsoever.  In addition, Dr. Jayaraman
                  shall  not  practise,  or  seek  to practise, in any other  jurisdiction,
                  without first notifying the College.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)