Jayashankar, Komathy (CPSO#: 76330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Gopalasundaram, Komathy (used until: 05 Mar 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Kilpauk Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bur Oak Medical Centre
Unit 5B
20 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 0A2
Phone: (905) 887-0042
Fax: (905) 887-0054
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Komathy Jayashankar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jayashankar ( CPSO# 76330 )

Business Address:
5B - 20 Bur Oak Avenue
Markham ON  L6C 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 887-0042

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOMATHY JAYASHANKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYASHANKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003