Jeanty, Sabrina Patricia (CPSO#: 94356)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012