Jee, Robert Michael (CPSO#: 86189)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Critical Care Wing 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78187
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Jee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jee ( CPSO# 86189 )
Dr. K. Jee ( CPSO# 90695 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Critical Care Wing Suite 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B307
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL JEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2013