Jeewa, Aamir (CPSO#: 89709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Cardiology
555 University Ave, 1725 Atrium
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 4168137654
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AAMIR JEEWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEEWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Jan 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 09 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2015