Jeffery, Andrew Herbert (CPSO#: 87098)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Jeffery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2014