Jefremova, Ljudmilla (CPSO#: 78482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:University of Tartu, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Whitby Medical Centre
Unit 6
1916 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L6
Phone: (905) 434-1662
Fax: (905) 434-7448
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

507 Eighth Avenue
Matheson ON  P0K 1N0
Canada
Phone: 7052732424
Fax: 7052732515
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Medical Emergency
Unit 9
6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Canada
Phone: (800) 265-3429
Fax: (905) 858-1399
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Jefremova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jefremova ( CPSO# 78482 )

Business Address:
East Whitby Medical Centre
6 - 1916 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L6
Phone Number: (905) 434-7448

Business Address:
9-145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  L5N 3E7
Phone Number: (905) 288-1021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LJUDMILLA JEFREMOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFREMOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2002 to 27 Sep 2002
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 07 Oct 2002 to 29 Nov 2002
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2005

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: Effective August 8, 2018, Dr. Jefremova has completed all components of her SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: As of May 17, 2018, Dr. Jefremova completed the requirements of her SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)