Jeganathan, Reubendra (CPSO#: 94700)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 21 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011