Jenner, Morris Reginald Frank (CPSO#: 19813)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: PO BOX 2187 St. Marys, ON N4X 1A1
Instructions: Medical records requests may be made to the above address.
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018