Jennings, Stacey Lynn (CPSO#: 81398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-99 Toronto Road
Port Hope ON  L1A 3S4
Phone: (905) 885-2626
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY LYNN JENNINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENNINGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2007