Jensen, Carlye Ann (CPSO#: 79721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone: (905) 852-1009
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carlye Jensen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Jensen ( CPSO# 79721 )

Business Address:
Suite B
2 Elgin Park Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 852-1009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Nov 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLYE ANN JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006