Jensen, Lorraine Frances (CPSO#: 95640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORRAINE FRANCES JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2015