Jerath, Angela (CPSO#: 89387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite 3EN
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5164
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Jerath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jerath ( CPSO# 89387 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite 3EN
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5164

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA JERATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JERATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2011