Jerome, Amanda Lee (CPSO#: 84284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4100 Upper Middle Rd
Burlington ON  L7M 4W8
Phone: (905) 635-3632
Fax: (905) 336-9220
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Jerome Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jerome ( CPSO# 84284 )

Business Address:
4100 Upper Middle Road
Burlington ON  L7M 4W8
Phone Number: (905) 635-3632

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA LEE JEROME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEROME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010