Jevremovic, Alexandra (CPSO#: 72371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Serbian

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
9325 Yonge Street
Unit 8
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0A8
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 3069
Fax: (905) 883-2052
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Vaughan Heart Institute
Lebovic Jewish Community Campus
9600 Bathurst Street
suite 305
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Canada
Phone: 416-588-3788
Fax: 416-588-5633
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra Jevremovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jevremovic ( CPSO# 72371 )

Business Address:
305-9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (416) 588-3788

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
8 - 9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3V3
Phone Number: (905) 508-8876

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 08 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA JEVREMOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEVREMOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006