Jeyaraj, Hamilton (CPSO#: 86403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Trust Clinics
Oshawa Health Centre
247 Simcoe Street North 1st Floor
Oshawa ON  L1G 4T3
Phone: (905) 728-7915
Fax: (905) 443-0171
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Trust Clinics
1471 Harmony Road
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K5
Canada
Phone: 905-440-7461
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

MyoMedicalMD
1939 Kennedy Road
Unit 105
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Canada
Phone: 4164120505
Fax: 4164120101
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Oshawa Pain Management Clinic
111 Simcoe Street North
Suite 100
Oshawa ON  L1G4S4
Canada
Phone: 289-316-1645
Fax: 289-316-1645
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hamilton Jeyaraj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jeyaraj ( CPSO# 86403 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Health Centre
247 Simcoe Street North
1st Floor
Oshawa ON  L1G 4T3
Phone Number: (905) 728-7915


Corporation Name: Subhra Mohapatra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jeyaraj ( CPSO# 86403 )
Dr. K. Efala ( CPSO# 80319 )
Dr. M. D'Souza ( CPSO# 91147 )
Dr. S. Mohapatra ( CPSO# 100565)
Dr. D. D'Souza ( CPSO# 100502)

Business Address:
Myo Medical MD
G1
145 Front Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 364-4052

Business Address:
Suite 105
1939 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 412-0505

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAMILTON JEYARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYARAJ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2009