Jha, Neilank Kumar (CPSO#: 81135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. N. Jha Medical Clinic
Unit 37
7575 HWY 27
Vaughan ON  L4L 4M5
Phone: 905-851-5539
Fax: 905-264-7909
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neilank Jha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jha ( CPSO# 81135 )

Business Address:
7575 Highway 27
Suite 37
Vaughan ON  L4L 4M5
Phone Number: (905) 851-5539

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEILANK KUMAR JHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Finding(s)

If, on or after June 1, 2015, a member is found guilty under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding of guilt to be posted on the register if the information is known to the College.

The following are findings of guilt made against this member on or after June 1, 2015, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

NEILANK KUMAR JHA was found guilty of the following on June 20, 2016:

(1) on or about August 27, 2013 in the City of Toronto, committing an assault on XX, contrary to the Criminal Code; and

(2) on or about August 29, 2013 in the City of Toronto, committing mischief by wilfully damaging without legal justification or excuse and without colour of right property to wit, an Iphone mobile telephone of XX the value of which did not exceed $5000 contrary to the Criminal Code.

He received an absolute discharge for both counts. He was ordered to pay restitution of $10,000 to XX and is subject to a peace bond in respect of XX for 12 months.