Jhajj, Prabhjote Singh (CPSO#: 92813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
40 Holly St.
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-8088
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Screening Clinic
40 College St.
Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5T3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Promed Endoscopy Clinic
1315 Finch Ave. West
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M3J 2G5
Canada
Phone: (416) 634-0001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

York Diagnostic Centre
3585 Keele St.
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Downsview Endoscopy Clinic
1635 Lawrence Ave. West
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M6L3C9
Canada
Phone: (416) 630-7388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4646 Dufferin St.
Unit 9
Toronto ON  M3H 5S4
Canada
Phone: 416-512-6407
Fax: 416-512-6375
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.S. Jhajj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jhajj ( CPSO# 92813 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Suite 301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
3585 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
601 - 40 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3C3

Business Address:
302 - 1315 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3J 2G5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRABHJOTE SINGH JHAJJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHAJJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015