Jhaveri, Kartik Sudhir (CPSO#: 76728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
610 University Avenue Room 3 957
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5635
Fax: (416) 946-6564
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4833
Fax: (416) 946-6564
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5635
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: K. Jhaveri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jhaveri ( CPSO# 76728 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
Princess Margaret Hospital
3 - 957
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 816-2465

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 816-2465

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 816-2465

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Mar 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Mar 2009 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Kartik  Sudhir  Jhaveri  may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology, only.