Jhirad, Ronen Haeem (CPSO#: 62544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: (905)889-1125 Ext. 301
Fax: (905)889-4216
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 Upper Centennial Parkway
2nd Floor
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Canada
Phone: (905)662-3303
Fax: (905)662-3304
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2119 Old Lakeshore Rd.
Burlington ON  L7R 1A4
Canada
Phone: (855)210-0757
Fax: (855)210-0758
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1370 Dundas Street East
Suite 304
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Canada
Phone: (905)306-9229
Fax: (905)306-7607
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONEN HAEEM JHIRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHIRAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Apr 1999 to 30 May 1999
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1992

Concerns

Source: Other Canadian Colleges
Active Date: July 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.

The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

On July 4, 2017, an Investigation Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Nova Scotia made a decision to reprimand Dr. Jhirad for failing to properly dispose of confidential medical records on or about April 1, 2016 in Sydney, Nova Scotia. The decision was made with the consent of Dr. Jhirad instead of referring the matter to a hearing. The College was notified of this finding by information received on March 5, 2018.