Jianfar, Jinoos (CPSO#: 108051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9080 Yonge st. Unit#5
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone: 905-597-2528
Fax: 905-597-2536
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Jianfar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jianfar ( CPSO# 108051)

Business Address:
Unit 5
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iran

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JINOOS JIANFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017