Jiang, Charles Cao Yang (CPSO#: 83112)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Jiang, Cao Yang (used until: 13 Aug 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Shanghai Second Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 09 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009