Jiang, Helen (CPSO#: 95997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Patient Networks
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone: (416) 362-8822
Fax: (416) 362-8877
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen Jiang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jiang ( CPSO# 95997 )

Business Address:
Patient Networks
157 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1X7
Phone Number: (416) 362-8822

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Mar 2013 to 01 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2014