Jin, Chunzi Jenny (CPSO#: 100764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Science Centre
Cancer Centre Of Southeastern
Ontario
25 King St W
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 650-0139
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHUNZI JENNY JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018