Jindal, Kunaal (CPSO#: 88480)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
605 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1J9
Phone: (416) 439-1718
Fax: 416-439-2526
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

362 fairlawn ave
Toronto ON  M5M 1T6
Canada
Phone: 416-256-5614
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kunaal Jindal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jindal ( CPSO# 88480 )

Business Address:
362 Fairlawn Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1T6
Phone Number: (416) 256-5614

Business Address:
605 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1J9
Phone Number: (416) 439-1718

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUNAAL JINDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINDAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2013