Jiwa, Ashifa (CPSO#: 81960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Community Health Centre
176 Wyndham St.N
Guelph, ON
N1H8N9
Guelph ON  N1H 8N9
Phone: (519) 821-6638
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St.
Guelph, ON
N1E4J4
Guelph ON  N1E4J4
Canada
Phone: 519-822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashifa Jiwa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jiwa ( CPSO# 81960 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
Emergency Department
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHIFA JIWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2004