Jobling, Rebekah Kjerland (CPSO#: 95137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Clinical and Metabolic
Genetics, Suite 940 525
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X3
Phone: (416) 813-6390
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBEKAH KJERLAND JOBLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOBLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016