Joffe, Robert (CPSO#: 86782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke Ontario
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Peel Memorial Urgent Care
20 Lynch St
Brampton
Toronto ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Joffe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Joffe ( CPSO# 86782 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Peel Memorial Urgent Care
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 949-2120

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOFFE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010