Joffe, Russell Trevor (CPSO#: 31269)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 12 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Sep 2017

Summary

Date of Death: 12-Sep-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Jersey
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1979
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 12 Sep 2017