Johanson, Curtis Rodney (CPSO#: 32796)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 23 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jan 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 23-Jan-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1981
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 23 Jan 2018