Bingham, John Lee (CPSO#: 32098)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1980
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jan 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Jan 2018
Summary:

On January 9, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Lee Bingham committed an act 
of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, and in that he has 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable 
or unprofessional.  
 
Dr. John Lee Bingham is a family physician who obtained his certificate of registration in Ontario 
on December 1, 1980. At the material time, he was practising psychotherapy in Toronto. 
 
Patient A 
 
Patient A, a woman in her 30s, saw Dr. Bingham in his office about eight times between July and 
August of 2016, following the death of her family member earlier in the year. She was having 
significant problems in her relationship with her partner at the time.  
 
At the first visit, Dr. Bingham asked Patient A if he could give her a hug because she was crying 
non-stop. Patient A agreed and thought Dr. Bingham was compassionate and seemed professional. 
Dr. Bingham hugged Patient A, which she described as a non-sexual, platonic hug. Thereafter, Dr. 
Bingham hugged Patient A after each appointment.   
 
After another visit, which was the last appointment of the day, as Patient A was planning to walk 
home, Dr. Bingham asked to walk with her. He said he was headed to a store in the same direction 
Patient A was walking. While walking with Patient A, Dr. Bingham said that he wondered what 
people would think seeing a pretty young girl like her with him. Patient A found this odd, but 
thought he was trying to make her feel good about herself. When Patient A and Dr. Bingham got 
to the store, they hugged as usual, but Dr. Bingham held her longer and closer than before, and 
then kissed her on the cheek. 
 
Following this, during Patient A’s last few appointments, Dr. Bingham asked her to pull her chair 
close to his and  helped her pull the chair over. The chairs were so close their knees were nearly 
touching. 
 
At the last appointment, while completing paperwork for Patient A’s employer, Dr. Bingham 
patted on Patient A’s thigh with his hand while she was wearing shorts and their chairs were 
moved close together. Dr. Bingham then said he would have to start seeing her every week. When 
Patient A asked if he had time in his schedule, Dr. Bingham responded that he always had time for 
her. When Patient A got up to leave, Dr. Bingham pulled her towards him for another hug. He told 
her he had been thinking about her a lot. He held her more tightly, like a bear hug, so that her 
body was pressed firmly against his with one of his hands on her lower back tailbone area, just 
below the waistline. Patient A describes herself as petite. Dr. Bingham is a tall, large man. He 
began rubbing her back and pressed his face to hers asking if it felt good. He placed Patient A’s 
head on his shoulder. She tried to pull away, but he held onto her arms. Dr. Bingham held Patient 
A’s face close to his, kissed her forehead and cheek, and kept looking at her mouth, which made 
Patient A feel he wanted to kiss her on the mouth. He said “sometimes two people just click.” He 
said that she was helping him too and that she gave him good feelings. Patient A left the 
appointment and did not see Dr. Bingham again. 
 
 
Prior Discipline History 
 
On June 6, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bingham had committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct. The conduct was in relation to a 27-year-old psychotherapy patient in 2001. After one of 
her sessions, Dr. Bingham hugged the patient as she was leaving his office and gave her a kiss on 
her lips. She did not return for further therapy as a result. Dr. Bingham’s certificate of registration 
was suspended for 6 months, he was ordered to complete the boundaries course and post security 
by way of letter of credit in the amount of $10,000 to guarantee the payment of any amount the 
College may pay out in respect of funding for the patient’s therapy and counseling.  
 
Between 2001 and 2016, there were no other complaints to the College about Dr. Bingham’s 
behaviour. 
 
Undertaking to Resign  
 
On January 9, 2018, Dr. Bingham entered into an undertaking to the College, by which he has, 
among other things, resigned his membership with the College and agreed never to apply or re-
apply for membership in Ontario or in any other jurisdiction. Had Dr. Bingham not resigned and 
agreed never to reapply, the College would have been seeking a very significant penalty. 
 
Disposition 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 
- Dr. Bingham appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- Dr. Bingham pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,500 within thirty (30) days from the 
  date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): january 9, 2018


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jun 2003
Summary:

 On June 6, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Lee Bingham committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under clause 1(1)33 of O/Reg. 856/93, in that he engaged in an act or 
 omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline 
 Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar shall forthwith suspend Dr. Bingham(s 
 certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months.  The Registrar shall suspend three (3) 
 months of this suspension on the following conditions:

(i)	that Dr. Bingham has successfully 
 completed a course on boundaries acceptable to the College.

(ii)	Dr. Bingham will post security 
 by way of letter of credit in the amount of $10,000.00, to guarantee the payment of any amount the 
 College may pay out in respect of funding for therapy and counselling.

2.	Dr. Bingham is to pay 
 costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00 prior to the completion of the suspension.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 06, 2003

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Bingham was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations that he engaged in professional misconduct in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Bingham did not contest the allegations of sexual abuse or disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

Dr. Bingham also resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)