John, Rohan (CPSO#: 88011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Aug 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street Suite 11E 225
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4560
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rohan John Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. John ( CPSO# 88011 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
200 Elizabeth Street Suite 11E-225
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4560

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 07 Aug 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Rohan  John  may  practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology,
            only.