John, Susan (CPSO#: 82594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 414
3030 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Canada
Phone: 416 439-2662
Fax: 416 439 2552
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan John Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. John ( CPSO# 82594 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (647) 341-3832

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 28 Feb 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 10 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 11 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2009