Johnson, Davin Emanuel (CPSO#: 93208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

LASIK MD Kingston
100 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7L 1A7
Canada
Phone: (613) 531-3337
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

LASIK MD Ottawa
407 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Canada
Phone: (613) 288-2020
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
19 Hospital Dr
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: (705) 658-4544
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davin E Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Johnson ( CPSO# 93208 )

Business Address:
100 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1A7
Phone Number: (613) 531-3337

Business Address:
407 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa ON  K1R 7Y7
Phone Number: (613) 288-2020

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVIN EMANUEL JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015