Johnson, Samuel Ceaser (CPSO#: 94664)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 11 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014